ME LD1168 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Voted: Divided Report
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To License Operators of Personnel Hoists

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To License Operators of Personnel Hoists

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-04-27JointWork Session Held
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-18HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-03-18HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on March 18, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback