ME LD1163 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue for Capital Improvements for Arts and Cultural Facilities
Title
An Act to Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue for Capital Improvements for Arts and Cultural Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-03-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1163&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0735&item=1&snum=131 |