ME LD1159 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Address Human Trafficking, Sex Trafficking and Prostitution
Title
An Act To Address Human Trafficking, Sex Trafficking and Prostitution
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-05-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-05-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Gerzofsky of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2013-03-26 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-03-26 | House | Representative DION for the Criminal Law Advisory Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 17-A, section 1354, subsection 2, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |