ME LD1156 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 745 Yeas 29 - Nays 3 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 745 Yeas 29 - Nays 3 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue to Promote the Design, Development and Maintenance of Trails for Outdoor Recreation and Active Transportation
Title
An Act to Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue to Promote the Design, Development and Maintenance of Trails for Outdoor Recreation and Active Transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Enactment-bond Issue RC #745 (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 745 Yeas 29 - Nays 3 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator STEWART of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Present Required, in concurrence. |
2024-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-11 | House | This being a Bond Authorization Act, in accordance with the provisions of Section 14 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of the membership of the House present was necessary. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-937), in concurrence. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-937) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-937). |
2024-04-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-04-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-04-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-03-29 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-03-29 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-03-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |