ME LD1143 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Full-day Kindergarten Programs
Title
An Act To Provide Full-day Kindergarten Programs
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Nelson [D] | Sen. Justin Alfond [D] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] |
Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D] | Rep. Barry Hobbins [D] | Rep. Andrew McLean [D] | Rep. Helen Rankin [D] |
Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-09 - House - Enactment - Mandate RC #423 (Y: 92 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2013-06-12 - House - Enactment RC #289 (Y: 91 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #225 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - House - Enactment RC #289 (Y: 91 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #225 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2013-07-09 | Senate | FAILED ENACTMENT , in concurrence. 2/3 Elected Required. |
2013-07-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-07-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 423 (Yeas 92 - Nays 51 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2013-07-09 | House | In accordance with the provisions of Section 21 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2013-07-09 | House | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-381) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-350) thereto |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-381) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-350) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Committee Amendment "A" (H-381) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-350) thereto READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-350) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-381) READ and ADOPTED |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-381) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-381) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 289 (Yeas 91 - Nays 54 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-381), in concurrence.. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-381) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-11 | Senate | (20 -Yeas, 14 -Nays, 1 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Roll Call Number 225 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-381). |
2013-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-381) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-10 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-10 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending the motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-06-07 | House | Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence. |
2013-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |