ME LD1134 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Maine Bail Code Regarding Certain Conditions of Release
Title
An Act To Amend the Maine Bail Code Regarding Certain Conditions of Release
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #399 (Y: 71 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #424 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #349 (Y: 82 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #424 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #349 (Y: 82 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 399V 71 having voted in the affirmative and 71 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2021-06-30 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2021-06-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-703) in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-703) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 424 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-703). |
2021-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-703) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 349 (Yeas 82 - Nays 57 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-16 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-18 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-18 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 18, 2021. |