ME LD1125 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Bureau of Alcoholic Beverages and Lottery Operations to Study Paying Bonuses to Agents for Selling Certain Winning Lottery Tickets
Title
Resolve, Directing the Bureau of Alcoholic Beverages and Lottery Operations to Study Paying Bonuses to Agents for Selling Certain Winning Lottery Tickets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2023-05-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-18 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2023-05-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-16 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-69). |
2023-05-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-05-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-69) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-69) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-05-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2023-05-04 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-04-10 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-04-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-16 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |