ME LD1124 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Change the Threshold for Creating a Specialty License Plate from 2,000 Prepaid Orders to 1,000 Prepaid Orders and To Extend by One Year the Time Allowed for Gathering Signatures
Title
An Act To Change the Threshold for Creating a Specialty License Plate from 2,000 Prepaid Orders to 1,000 Prepaid Orders and To Extend by One Year the Time Allowed for Gathering Signatures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 18, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1124&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0387&item=1&snum=130 |