ME LD1114 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Eliminate the Annual Medical Eligibility Determinations of Need for Families of Children with Disabilities
Title
An Act to Eliminate the Annual Medical Eligibility Determinations of Need for Families of Children with Disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-01-30 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2024-01-18 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2024-01-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-04-26 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2023-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |