ME LD1108 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Ordered Sent Forthwith.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Restore Public Health Nursing Services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Restore Public Health Nursing Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #462 (Y: 101 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #422 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - House - Enactment RC #434 (Y: 82 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #271 (Y: 83 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #249 (Y: 5 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02HouseOrdered Sent Forthwith.
2017-08-02HouseIn concurrence. Sent to the Engrossing Department.
2017-08-02HouseROLL CALL NO. 462V 101 having voted in the affirmative and 34 in the negative, with 15 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
2017-08-02HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2017-08-02SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-08-02SenateLD 1108 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 29 IN FAVOR and 5 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2017-07-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-07-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-20HouseROLL CALL NO. 434 (Yeas 82 - Nays 51 - Absent 17 - Excused 1)
2017-07-20HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-07-20HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-20HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-155) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-329) thereto.
2017-07-20SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-07-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-155) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-329) In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-07-20SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-329) READ and ADOPTED
2017-07-20SenateOn motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
2017-07-20SenateOn Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2017-06-12SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
2017-06-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-09HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-08HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-08HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-155).
2017-06-08HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-06-08HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-155) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-08HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-06-08HouseROLL CALL NO. 271 (Yeas 83 - Nays 62 - Absent 5 - Excused 1)
2017-06-08HouseOn motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-08HouseReports READ.
2017-06-07SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-06-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-155)
2017-06-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-155) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-07SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-07SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2017-06-07SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 249 Yeas 5 - Nays 30 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2017-06-07SenateSubsequently the motion to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED
2017-06-07SenateTaken from the table by the President FAILED
2017-06-06SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-05SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-01SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-31SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-31SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report,
2017-05-31SenateSenator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.
2017-05-31SenateReports READ
2017-03-21HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-21HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2017-03-21SenateCommittee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1108&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0362&item=1&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0362&item=2&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0362&item=4&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0362&item=5&snum=128
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280064160&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=249
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280064160&chamber=House&serialnumber=271
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280064160&chamber=House&serialnumber=434
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280064160&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=422
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280064160&chamber=House&serialnumber=462

Bill Comments

feedback