ME LD1108 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - RELEASED.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - RELEASED.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Children and the Public from Vapor from Electronic Smoking Devices
Title
An Act To Protect Children and the Public from Vapor from Electronic Smoking Devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #273 (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #256 (Y: 90 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #256 (Y: 90 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator CUSHING of Penobscot. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2015-06-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-428) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-428) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 273 8 Yeas - 27 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent Subsequently, The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. READ ONCE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to accept the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-428). |
2015-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-06-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-428) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 256 (Yeas 90 - Nays 56 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2015-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |