ME LD1107 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Maine Connectivity Authority To Take Further Actions To Bring High-speed Broadband to Unserved Areas
Title
Resolve, Directing the Maine Connectivity Authority To Take Further Actions To Bring High-speed Broadband to Unserved Areas
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Rep. Nathan Carlow [R] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Louis Luchini [D] |
Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. Nathan Wadsworth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-04-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-496). |
2022-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-04-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-496). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-496) READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-01 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-03-18 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-03-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-03-03 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 18, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |