ME LD1106 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Dedicate All Sales Taxes from All Vehicle Sales and Any Vehicle-related Sales to the Highway Fund for Roads and Bridge Capital Improvements
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Dedicate All Sales Taxes from All Vehicle Sales and Any Vehicle-related Sales to the Highway Fund for Roads and Bridge Capital Improvements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #224 (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #221 (Y: 79 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #221 (Y: 79 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator DOW of Lincoln The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-387) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-07 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-387) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-387) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 224 Yeas 25 - Nays 10 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator DOW of Lincoln the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 221 (Yeas 79 - Nays 67 - Absent 4 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-05 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2017-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-21 | House | The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |