ME LD1091 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services to Review Its Rules Regarding Campgrounds in Order to Ensure Campground Health and Safety
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services to Review Its Rules Regarding Campgrounds in Order to Ensure Campground Health and Safety
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin O'Connell [D] | Rep. Lydia Crafts [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] |
Rep. Karen Montell [D] | Rep. Joseph Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-04-21 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2023-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-09 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |