ME LD1084 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, To Improve Continuity of Coverage for Participants in Medicare Advantage Plans
Title
Resolve, To Improve Continuity of Coverage for Participants in Medicare Advantage Plans
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Mills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-12 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) | |
2009-05-06 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-05 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-04-30 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) | |
2009-04-30 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-04-29 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-03-17 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. | |
2009-03-17 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-03-17 | (S) On motion by Senator Bowman of York REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES | |
2009-03-17 | (S) Committee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |