ME LD1080 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, Regarding Biofuel in Heating Oil

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, Regarding Biofuel in Heating Oil

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-05-08SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2019-05-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-07HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2019-05-07HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2019-05-02SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-05-02SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-148), in concurrence.
2019-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-148) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-02SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-05-02SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-30HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-148).
2019-04-30HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-04-30HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-03-05SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence
2019-03-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-05HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
2019-03-05HouseCommittee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback