ME LD1080 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-12 - (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-12 - (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, To Create a Working Group To Study Landlord and Tenant Issues
Title
Resolve, To Create a Working Group To Study Landlord and Tenant Issues
Sponsors
Rep. John Tuttle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-12 | (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2009-06-11 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-11 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-06-11 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-11 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-319) thereto | |
2009-06-11 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-06-11 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-319) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2009-06-11 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-319) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2009-06-11 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-319) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-06-11 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator House Amendment "B" (H-546) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) INDEFINITELY POSTPONED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2009-06-11 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of House Amendment "B" (H-546) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) in concurrence | |
2009-06-11 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) As Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-546) thereto in concurrence | |
2009-06-11 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-546) thereto in concurrence | |
2009-06-11 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-06-10 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-06-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FINAL PASSAGE (Emergency -2/3 Elected Required) in concurrence Roll Call Requested | |
2009-06-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-10 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-06-08 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-546) thereto in concurrence | |
2009-06-08 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-546) thereto ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-08 | (S) House Amendment "B" (H-546) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-08 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) READ | |
2009-06-08 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-06-08 | (S) On motion by Senator SULLIVAN of York Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-08 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-06-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-05 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-546) thereto. | |
2009-06-05 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-546) thereto ADOPTED. | |
2009-06-05 | (H) Subsequently, House Amendment "B" (H-546) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) ADOPTED. | |
2009-06-05 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-06-05 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-06-05 | (H) On motion of Representative PIOTTI of Unity TABLED pending ADOPTION of House Amendment "B" (H-546) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-489). | |
2009-06-05 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "B" (H-546) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) was READ. | |
2009-06-05 | (H) On motion of Representative TUTTLE of Sanford, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-489). | |
2009-06-05 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-06-04 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-06-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) On motion of Representative TUTTLE of Sanford, Tabled PENDING PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-489). | |
2009-06-02 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) Representative TUTTLE of Sanford OBJECTED to SUSPENDING THE RULES for the purpose of giving this Bill its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-489) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) The Resolve was READ ONCE. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) On motion of Representative TRINWARD of Waterville, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) Reports READ. |