ME LD1073 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Clarify Laws Regarding Maine's Community Colleges

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Clarify Laws Regarding Maine's Community Colleges

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-08HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-07HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-07HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-194).
2017-06-07HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-06-07HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-06-06SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2017-06-06SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-194).
2017-06-06SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-194) READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-06SenateREAD ONCE.
2017-06-06SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2017-03-16HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-16HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2017-03-16SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-03-16SenateREFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
2017-03-16SenateCommittee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback