ME LD1066 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Board of Trustees of the Maine Criminal Justice Academy To Amend Its Minimum Standards for the Law Enforcement Use of Force Policy
Title
Resolve, Directing the Board of Trustees of the Maine Criminal Justice Academy To Amend Its Minimum Standards for the Law Enforcement Use of Force Policy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-12 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-05-07 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-200) in concurrence | |
2009-05-07 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-06 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-06 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-200) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-06 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-06 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-05 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-200) | |
2009-05-05 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-05 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-04-30 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-03-17 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Gerzofsky of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |