ME LD1060 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the State Revenue from Casino Net Income, Reallocate the State Distribution and Provide Tax Uniformity
Title
An Act To Increase the State Revenue from Casino Net Income, Reallocate the State Distribution and Provide Tax Uniformity
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Babbidge [D] | Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D] | Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] |
Sen. Joseph Rafferty [D] | Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-04-08 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-04-02 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-04-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1060&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0789&item=1&snum=130 |