ME LD1047 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Consideration of Naloxone Purchases in Life Insurance Underwriting
Title
An Act To Prohibit Consideration of Naloxone Purchases in Life Insurance Underwriting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-106). |
2019-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-23 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-106) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-23 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-23 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-106) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-106) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator SANBORN, H. of Cumberland to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senator SANBORN, H. of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-02-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |