ME LD1044 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Prosecution of Individuals Possessing a Controlled Substance under Certain Circumstances
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Prosecution of Individuals Possessing a Controlled Substance under Certain Circumstances
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Dorney [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Rep. Anne Graham [D] | Rep. Jane Pringle [D] |
Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #247 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-11 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #284 (Y: 97 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #284 (Y: 97 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2013-06-12 | Senate | ____________________ |
2013-06-12 | Senate | (H.P. 735) (L.D. 1044) "An Act to Amend the Laws Governing Prosecution of Individuals Possessing a Controlled Substance under Certain Circumstances" In Senate, June 12, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 21 in favor and 14 against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2013-06-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 284V 97 having voted in the affirmative and 47 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2013-06-11 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2013-06-11 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-11 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-11 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham the Bill was TABLED pending RECONSIDERATION. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-205) , in concurrence. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-205) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-205). |
2013-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-05-21 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-205) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-21 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-05-21 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Gerzofsky of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY, in concurrence. |
2013-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |