ME LD1043 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Establish Universal Public Preschool Programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Establish Universal Public Preschool Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-05-28SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-23HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-21SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-05-21SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-256), in concurrence.
2019-05-21SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-256) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-21SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-05-21SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-16HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-256).
2019-05-16HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-05-16HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-02-28SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2019-02-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2019-02-28HouseCommittee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback