ME LD1038 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Facilitate a Timely Revision Process in the Site Location of Development Laws
Title
An Act To Facilitate a Timely Revision Process in the Site Location of Development Laws
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Keim [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #77 (Y: 79 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #160 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #160 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 77 (Yeas 79 - Nays 66 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-02 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 160 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |