ME LD1038 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Convene a Stakeholder Group on Funding and Training for the State's Hazardous Materials Emergency Response Teams and the Acquisition of Equipment
Title
Resolve, To Convene a Stakeholder Group on Funding and Training for the State's Hazardous Materials Emergency Response Teams and the Acquisition of Equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-319), in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-319) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-319). |
2019-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2019-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |