MD SB998 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing St. Mary's County or a municipal corporation in St. Mary's County to grant a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on property that is owned or leased by specified new or expanding businesses; providing that the property tax credit may not be granted for more than 10 years; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2016.
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Tax Credit - New or Expanding Businesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Sanchez) Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Small Business
St. Mary's County
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment
Property Tax
Small Business
St. Mary's County
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment