MD SB992 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "elevated level of lead" for purposes of certain provisions of law requiring the periodic testing for the presence of lead in drinking water outlets in occupied public and nonpublic school buildings; and requiring by August 1, 2021, a school to take certain remedial measures on a drinking water outlet tested on or before June 1, 2020, if the test indicated a concentration of lead that was more than 5 parts per billion but less than 20 parts per billion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Buildings - Drinking Water Outlets - Elevated Level of Lead (Safe School Drinking Water Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseReferred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means
2020-02-27SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-02-25SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-25SenateFloor Amendment {833022/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted
2020-02-25SenateFavorable with Amendments {404338/1 Adopted
2020-02-24SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-04SenateHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB1475 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment61501(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment61502(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment61503(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback