MD SB991 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-06 - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-06 - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a police officer to charge by citation for the crimes of sale of an alcoholic beverage to an underage drinker or intoxicated person, malicious destruction of property if the amount of damage to property is less than $500, and theft of property or services with a value of less than $1,000; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Citation Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Citations
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Emergency Bills
Law Enforcement
Minors
Theft
Vandalism
Citations
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Emergency Bills
Law Enforcement
Minors
Theft
Vandalism