MD SB991 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an insurer that issues a policy of homeowner's insurance from requiring the policy to include coverage for other structures such as sheds or outbuildings if the policyholder does not have a shed or outbuilding on the property.
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Coverage for Other Structures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Unfavorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-21 | Re-referred Finance | |
2011-03-18 | Referred Senate Rules | |
2011-03-18 | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Stone) Adopted | |
2011-03-18 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/SB0991.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/sb/sb0991f.pdf |