MD SB988 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the State Board of Community Health Workers; specifying the purpose and composition of the Board; providing that the role of community health workers does not include providing clinical services; specifying the term of a Board member; requiring the Governor to appoint a new member, within a specified time period, if a vacancy on the Board occurs; authorizing the Governor to remove a member of the Board under specified circumstances; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to serve as the chair of the Board; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] |
Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-30 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {344838/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Criminal Background Investigations
Governor
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Hearings
Public Health
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Subpoenas
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Community Facilities and Services
Criminal Background Investigations
Governor
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Hearings
Public Health
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Subpoenas
Time
Work, Labor and Employment