MD SB983 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the Maryland Historical Society receive, for fiscal year 2020 and each fiscal year thereafter, $250,000 from certain funds distributed to the Maryland State Arts Council from certain revenue distributed from the State admissions and amusement tax on electronic bingo and electronic tip jars.
Title
Maryland Historical Society - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-04-07 | House | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2018-04-06 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Admissions and Amusement Tax
Appropriations
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Historical Matters
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Appropriations
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Historical Matters
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials