MD SB974 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified errors may not constitute fraud or grounds for recoupment of specified claims payments under specified circumstances; specifying that specified claims remain subject to recoupment of overpayment or payment of any discovered underpayment by a pharmacy benefits manager; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Claims
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-31 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Substitute Committee Amendment (Finance) Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Committee Amendment Withdrawn | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-30 | Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Astle) Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-29 | Laid Over (Senator Astle) Adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-03-15 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-14 | Re-referred Finance | |
2011-03-07 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Contracts
Disclosure
Discrimination
Drugs
Fraud
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Contracts
Disclosure
Discrimination
Drugs
Fraud
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports