MD SB97 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 523
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing insureds to protest certain proposed actions of insurers, with respect to a policy of private passenger motor vehicle liability insurance or a binder of private passenger motor vehicle liability insurance, by filing the protest electronically through the consumer complaint portal on the Maryland Insurance Administration's website within 30 days after the mailing date on the notice of proposed action; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Protests - Consumer Complaint Portal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 523
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-03-04HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-24HouseReferred Economic Matters
2020-01-23SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-01-21SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-01-21SenateFavorable with Amendments {447379/1 Adopted
2020-01-20SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-12-19SenateHearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-08SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-09-09SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance27613(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback