MD SB968 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "captive REIT" for purposes of a certain addition modification under the Maryland income tax in the amount of the federal dividends paid deduction for captive real estate investment trusts to exclude, under certain circumstances, corporations, trusts, or associations owned or controlled by certain qualified foreign entities and certain trusts owned or controlled by a listed Australian property trust.
Title
Income Tax - Captive Real Estate Investment Trusts - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2023-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:15 p.m. |
2023-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {963323/1 Adopted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 3:00 p.m. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 306.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |