MD SB965 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing, from $500,000 to $1,500,000, the amount of certain court costs collected by the District Court that the Comptroller is required to pay into the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Funding

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
2019-03-04SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-25SenateHearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback