MD SB964 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Agriculture from certifying and registering a site that will be used to grow or cultivate hemp under the Hemp Research Pilot Program if the area on which the hemp will be grown is located within 2 miles of a residential community with 10 or more residences; and prohibiting the Department from issuing a license to a person to produce hemp in the State if the area on which the hemp will be produced is located within 2 miles of a residential community with 10 or more residences.
Title
Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production - Prohibitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB510 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Cannabis
Farmland
Licenses
Residential Property
Weights and Measures
Agriculture, Department of
Cannabis
Farmland
Licenses
Residential Property
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 14 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 14 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |