MD SB964 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, on or before October 1, 2018, certain government agencies and organizations to submit an independent report to the Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth victims of Human Trafficking and the university of Maryland School of Social Work Child Sex Trafficking Initiative; requiring the report to include certain information; requiring the Workgroup to establish a certain subcommittee to consider recommendations on the provision of statewide services for youth victims of human trafficking; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and Reports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {797770/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-15SenateHearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback