MD SB961 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Maryland Biotech SBIR and STTR Bridge Program to be administered by the Maryland Technology Development Corporation for specified purposes; authorizing the Program to provide grants to specified eligible biotechnology businesses; stating the purpose of the Program; establishing the Maryland Biotech SBIR and STTR Bridge Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund for specified purposes; providing for the administration, sources, and use of the Fund; requiring a specified audit of the Fund; etc.
Title
Maryland Biotech SBIR and STTR Bridge Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-03-01 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-20 | Re-referred Finance | |
2012-02-15 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Commerce and Business
Federal Government
Grants
Industry and Technology
Medical Research
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Auditors and Audits
Commerce and Business
Federal Government
Grants
Industry and Technology
Medical Research
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0961.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0961f.pdf |