MD SB952 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB851
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the method for filling a vacancy on the Frederick County Board of Education.
Title
Frederick County - Board of Education - Vacancies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
SB851 (Carry Over) 2021-03-30 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
County Councils
County Executives
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Frederick County
Registration
Time
Voting
County Executives
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Frederick County
Registration
Time
Voting