MD SB948 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the authorization to harvest oysters from the list of activities authorized under an unlimited tidal fish license; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to, by regulation, modify the total number of certain commercial oyster authorizations based on certain factors; for the license year beginning on September 1, 2020, requiring the Department to issue a certain commercial oyster authorization only to a licensee who meets certain requirements; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Oyster Authorizations - Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Dredging
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters
Rules and Regulations
Time
Weights and Measures
Dredging
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters
Rules and Regulations
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 4 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |