MD SB947 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Maryland Transportation Authority from charging an administrative fee or a civil penalty for failure to pay video tolls for which processing or billing was delayed due to COVID-19 related-factors until 180 days after the Authority has eliminated the toll charge backlog; requiring the Authority to reimburse the registered owner of a motor vehicle that incurred a certain video toll the amount of any administrative fees or civil penalties paid; and applying the Act to certain video tolls incurred on or after March 5, 2020.
Title
Transportation - Electronic Toll Collection Backlog - Fee Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1435 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-22 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Emergency Bills
Fees
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Video
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Emergency Bills
Fees
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Video
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0947?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0947f.pdf |