MD SB944 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the penalty for causing life-threatening injury as a result of negligently driving, operating, or controlling a motor vehicle or vessel while impaired by a controlled dangerous substance.
Title
Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Impaired by a
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-09 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-04-09 | Hearing 4/9 at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2012-04-02 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments 978976/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-20 | Re-referred Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-13 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Accidents
Boats and Ships
Crimes and Punishments
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Boats and Ships
Crimes and Punishments
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences