MD SB943 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 683
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 683
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Center for Cybersecurity at the University of Maryland Baltimore County to be housed within the College of Engineering and Information Technology and to provide certain assistance related to cybersecurity; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of at least $3,000,000 for the Center; requiring the Center to report to the General Assembly by October 1 each year on the use of State funds for certain purposes in the field of cybersecurity; etc.
Title
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016 - Appropriations, Degree and Credential Programs, and Center for Cybersecurity
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 683 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-22) |
2021-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {754461/1 Adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {499630/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Prince George's County
State Universities and Colleges
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Prince George's County
State Universities and Colleges
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 12 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 12 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |