MD SB933 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1031
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1031
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering eligibility for a performing arts theater license in Harford County by altering the definition of "performing arts theater" and authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue the license to a certain for-profit theater, rather than a nonprofit theater; authorizing the holder of the license to sell liquor for on-premises consumption in addition to beer and wine; and altering the license fee from $500 to $1,500.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Theater License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1031 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {923921/1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1118 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1030
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Fees
Food
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Fees
Food
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1005.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |