MD SB93 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 533
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 533
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the amount of a credit against certain State taxes for certain wages paid and certain child care or transportation expenses incurred by certain business entities with respect to qualified employees with disabilities.
Title
Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 533 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Child Care
Disabilities
Disabled
Franchise Tax
Income Tax
Insurance
Salaries and Compensation
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Transportation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Disabilities
Disabled
Franchise Tax
Income Tax
Insurance
Salaries and Compensation
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Transportation
Work, Labor, and Employment