MD SB924 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining the term "splash pad" to mean an outdoor play area with sprinklers, fountains, nozzles, or other devices or structures that spray water, in which water is not allowed to accumulate, and that is not used for submersion of the human body; and authorizing the governing body of a county to adopt and enforce rules and regulations to govern the sanitary condition of splash pads and any sanitary feature connected to a splash pad.
Title
Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {967479/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Counties
County Administrators
County Councils
County Executives
Environmental Health
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sports and Recreation
Water
County Administrators
County Councils
County Executives
Environmental Health
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sports and Recreation
Water