MD SB92 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that specified regulated lobbyists complete an initial and subsequent ethics training course provided by the State Ethics Commission within 6 months of the regulated lobbyists initial registration; and requiring a specified regulated lobbyist to attend a course provided by the State Ethics Commission at least once in any 2-year period during which the lobbyist has registered with the Ethics Commission.
Title
Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Ethics Training Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {774631/2 Report Adopted |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-09-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |