MD SB92 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2023 the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring the Board to submit a report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2012; etc.
Title
State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-15 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-18 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2011-02-17 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-02-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/2 at 2:30 p.m. | |
2011-01-21 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Equipment
Heating and Cooling
Licenses
Reports
Sunset
Utilities
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Equipment
Heating and Cooling
Licenses
Reports
Sunset
Utilities