MD SB917 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each unit of State government and certain local agencies to submit a certain report related to information technology and cybersecurity to the Department of Information Technology on or before September 1 each year; establishing the required contents of certain reports; and requiring the Department to compile and analyze certain information and report to each unit of State government and the General Assembly certain information and recommendations by December 31 each year; etc.
Title
Department of Information Technology - Status of Information Technology and Cybersecurity in State and Local Agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB587 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Consumer Protection
Cybersecurity
Data
Disclosure
Examinations
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Internet Access
Local Government - Generally
Records
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Consumer Protection
Cybersecurity
Data
Disclosure
Examinations
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Internet Access
Local Government - Generally
Records
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |