MD SB916 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting penalty and arrest for a medical cannabis dispensary or its agents for acquiring, possessing, transferring, transporting, selling, distributing, or dispensing medical cannabis, products containing medical cannabis, related supplies, or educational materials for use by a certain independent testing laboratory or its agents; establishing the Medical Cannabis Laboratory Advisory Council; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Advisory Council; etc.
Title
Medical Cannabis - Dispensaries and Medical Cannabis Laboratory Advisory Council
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Agents and Brokers
Cannabis
Cannabis Distribution
Cannabis Production
Chemical Tests
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Drugs
Education
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Food
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Laboratories
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Names
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Public Officials
Reimbursement Rates
Retail Sales
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Transportation
Work, Labor and Employment
Agents and Brokers
Cannabis
Cannabis Distribution
Cannabis Production
Chemical Tests
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Drugs
Education
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Food
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Laboratories
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Names
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Public Officials
Reimbursement Rates
Retail Sales
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Transportation
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 3307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3311.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |